Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Cui Shouxun (Tsui Shou-hsun, Tsoei Shou-hsŁn)

Deceased

Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1877Born
19 Mar 190426.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 192951.8AppointedPrefect of YŁngnien [Weixian], China
16 Mar 193355.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanais
16 Mar 193355.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of YŁngnien [Weixian], China
11 Jun 193355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanais
11 Apr 194668.7AppointedBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China
1953²75.4DiedBishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cui Shouxun (Tsui Shou-hsun, Tsoei Shou-hsŁn)
Bishop Joseph Cui Shouxun (Tsui Shou-hsun, Tsoei Shou-hsŁn) (born , died 1953) Bishop of Yongnian [YŁngnien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiaohsien
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1933, Number 34
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast