Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Zhao Zhen-sheng (Chao Cheng-sheng), S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1894BornKinhsien
191318.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Aug 192328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Dec 193743.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian], China
2 Dec 193743.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
27 Mar 193843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
11 Apr 194651.4AppointedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China
1970²75.1DiedBishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Zhao Zhen-sheng (Chao Cheng-sheng):
Bishop Francis Xavier Zhao Zhen-sheng (Chao Cheng-sheng) S.J. (born ) Bishop of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013