Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Lin Quan] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1913Born
1939²25.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 195844.6SelectedBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
21 Jan 196248.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
1991²77.1ResignedBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
25 Apr 200793.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lin Quan
Bishop Joseph Lin Quan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fuzhou [Foochow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNantang, Cathedral, Peking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceFujian

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 41
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,084
  • r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • obd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast