Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Yi Xuanhua (Yi Hsüan-hua)

Deceased

Bishop of Xiangyang [Siangyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1900Born
14 Feb 192625.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 193635.5AppointedPrefect of Siangyang [Xiangyang], China
10 May 195150.4AppointedBishop of Xiangyang [Siangyang], China
7 Feb 195251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Xiangyang [Siangyang], China
1974²73.1DiedBishop of Xiangyang [Siangyang], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Yi Xuanhua (Yi Hsüan-hua)
Bishop Francis Yi Xuanhua (Yi Hsüan-hua) (born , died 1974) Bishop of Xiangyang [Siangyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChayüankow
Ordained BishopSiangyang

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 10
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast