Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Ye Yin-yun] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1906¹Born
31 Mar 193427.8Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 195852.0SelectedBishop of [Huizhou (Patriotic), China]
21 Jan 196255.6Ordained BishopBishop of [Huizhou (Patriotic), China]
Sep 1981³75.2AppointedBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China
13 Mar 1990³83.8DiedBishop of Guangzhou [Canton], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ye Yin-yun
Bishop Joseph Ye Yin-yun (born , died ) Bishop of Guangzhou [Canton]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNantang, Cathedral, Peking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 44
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,088

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast