Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Anthony Zhong Quanzhang] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Meixian [Kaying], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Meizhou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1921²Born
1948²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 198968.3Ordained BishopBishop of Meixian [Kaying], China
28 Jan 200079.0DiedBishop of Meixian [Kaying], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Zhong Quanzhang
Bishop Anthony Zhong Quanzhang (born 1921, died ) Bishop of Meixian [Kaying]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJakarta, Vicariate Apostolic of Batavia, Indonesia
Ordained BishopMeizhou, Diocese of Meixian [Kaying]

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast