Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Benedict Cai Xiufeng] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Wuzhou [Wuchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1917Born
3 Dec 194831.8Ordained PriestPriest
1950²32.9SelectedAdministrator of Wuzhou [Wuchow], China
1993²75.9SelectedBishop of Wuzhou [Wuchow], China
3 Dec 199376.8Ordained BishopBishop of Wuzhou [Wuchow], China
20 Aug 200790.5DiedBishop of Wuzhou [Wuchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedict Cai Xiufeng
Bishop Benedict Cai Xiufeng (born , died ) Bishop of Wuzhou [Wuchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePingnan
Ordained BishopSacré Coeur, Cathedral, Canton, Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,129
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 25 Jan 2020

Quantcast