Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]

Dioecesis Chiammenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guangzhou [Canton]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 35,000 (13,518 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Jiangmen, Guangdong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen]
31 January 1924ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen]
3 February 1927ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen] Vicariate Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen]
Diocese of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen] Diocese of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]
19508,2924,000,000.2%37372243821ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 21 Oct 2012