Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Zhong Huai-de] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China

Bishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1917³Born
25 Apr 194325.9Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 195841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Zhoucun [Chowtsun], China
1980¹62.6AppointedBishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China
27 Jun 199780.1DiedBishop of Jinan [Tsinan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhong Huai-de
Bishop Joseph Zhong Huai-de (born , died ) Bishop of Jinan [Tsinan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopJinan, Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
Death PlacePeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,053

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Sep 2020

Quantcast