Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Francis Zhang Feng-zao] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1915Born
11 Jun 194226.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 199074.6Ordained BishopBishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China
6 May 199478.5DiedBishop of Wuhu [Wuhu], China

MicroData Summary for Francis Zhang Feng-zao
Bishop Francis Zhang Feng-zao (born , died ) Bishop of Wuhu [Wuhu]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 21 Dec 2019

Quantcast