Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Tu Shi-hua, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puqi [Puchi], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (recognized posthumously)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1919Born
Apr 1944³24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
19 Jul 195939.6SelectedBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
26 Jul 195939.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hanyang [Hanyang], China
2001²81.1AppointedBishop of Puqi [Puchi], China
4 Jan 201797.1DiedBishop of Puqi [Puchi], China
22 Sep 201898.8Confirmed

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Tu Shi-hua
Bishop Anthony Tu Shi-hua O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Puqi [Puchi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMianyang, Hubei province
Death PlaceBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 72.7 years
  • a bishop for 57.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Sep 2018
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 25 Sep 2018

Quantcast