Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Marc Yuan Wen-hua], O.F.M. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Wuchang [Wuchang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1904Born
3 Jan 193227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 195853.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wuchang [Wuchang], China
8 Jan 197368.4DiedBishop of Wuchang [Wuchang], China

MicroData Summary for Marc Yuan Wen-hua
Bishop Marc Yuan Wen-hua O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Wuchang [Wuchang]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHankow, Archdiocese of Hankow [Hankou]

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 2
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Dec 2019

Quantcast