Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Wang Xue-ming (Hsueh-ming)

Deceased

Archbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1910BornSiaonor
28 Jul 193524.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 195140.9AppointedArchbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
7 Oct 195141.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China
10 Feb 199786.4DiedArchbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan], China

MicroData Summary for Francis Wang Xue-ming (Hsueh-ming):
Archbishop Francis Wang Xue-ming (Hsueh-ming) (born , died ) Archbishop of Hohhot [Suiyüan]

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013