Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Lawrence Zhang Wen-bin] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Weinan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1915Born
1943²27.5Ordained PriestPriest
1952²36.5SelectedAdministrator of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
1981²65.5SelectedBishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
24 Jul 198166.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
2000²84.5ResignedBishop of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China
24 Dec 200287.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Tongzhou [Tungchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Zhang Wen-bin
Bishop Lawrence Zhang Wen-bin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tongzhou [Tungchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Sep 2020

Quantcast