Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Bonaventura Luo Juan (Luo Jung)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1917Born
19 Jul 194426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Shohchow [Shuoxian], China
1990²72.0SelectedBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China
8 Jul 199072.5Ordained BishopBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China
15 Mar 200789.2DiedBishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Luo Juan (Luo Jung)
Bishop Bonaventura Luo Juan (Luo Jung) (born , died ) Bishop of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXin'anzhuang, Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]
Ordained BishopTaiyuan, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]
Death PlaceShuozhou, Diocese of Shuoxian [Shohchow]

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast