Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Su Changshan

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1925¹Born
1953²28.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jan 200075.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
4 Dec 200681.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Su Changshan
Bishop John Baptist Su Changshan (born 1925, died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonglu
Ordained BishopImmaculťe Conception, Cathedral, Beijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast