Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Jiang Taoran

Deceased

Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Shijiazhuang)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1926Born
1953²26.4Ordained PriestPriest
1989²62.4SelectedBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China
21 May 198962.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China
2008²81.4ConfirmedBishop
15 Nov 201084.3DiedBishop of Zhengding [Chengting], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Jiang Taoran
Bishop Paul Jiang Taoran (born , died ) Bishop of Zhengding [Chengting]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQingyuan county, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-Yüan]
Ordained BishopShijiazhuang
Death PlaceShijiazhuang

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,118
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast