Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Fang Jianping

Bishop of Yongping [Yüngping], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Tangshan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1962 Born
6 Aug 198926.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jan 200037.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yongping [Yüngping], China
2002²39.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Yongping [Yüngping], China
8 Jun 200845.5SucceededBishop of Yongping [Yüngping], China
17 Nov 201047.9SelectedBishop of Yongping [Yüngping], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Fang Jianping
Bishop Peter Fang Jianping (born ) Bishop of Yongping [Yüngping]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLulong county
Ordained BishopImmaculée Conception, Cathedral, Beijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yongping [Yüngping].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,675

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast