Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chen Gong’ ao

Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1964 Born
26 Aug 199025.9Ordained PriestPriest
2002²37.2ConfirmedBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China
2005²40.2SelectedAdministrator of Nanchong [Shunking], China
2010²45.2SelectedBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China
19 Apr 201247.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nanchong [Shunking], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chen Gong’ ao
Bishop Joseph Chen Gong’ ao (born ) Bishop of Nanchong [Shunking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Nanchong, Diocese of Nanchong [Shunking]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nanchong [Shunking].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,423

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast