Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Liu Yuanren] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1923³Born
3 Jun 195330.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 199370.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China
20 Apr 200582.0DiedBishop of Nanjing [Nanking], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Liu Yuanren
Bishop Joseph Liu Yuanren (born , died ) Bishop of Nanjing [Nanking]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQidong county, Jiangsu
Ordained BishopNanking, Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
Death PlacePeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,130
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 25 Jan 2020

Quantcast