Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Matthias Ma Long-lin] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1917¹Born
1951²34.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 198164.5Ordained BishopBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China
9 Jun 199982.4DiedBishop of Suzhou [Soochow], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Ma Long-lin
Bishop Matthias Ma Long-lin (born 1917, died ) Bishop of Suzhou [Soochow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast