Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Michael Yang Gao-jian], O.S.A. †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Changde [Changteh], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1913¹Born
1938²24.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
23 Oct 195845.0SelectedBishop of Changde [Changteh], China
26 Oct 195845.0Ordained BishopBishop of Changde [Changteh], China
20 Jan 199581.3DiedBishop of Changde [Changteh], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Yang Gao-jian
Bishop Michael Yang Gao-jian O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Changde [Changteh]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChangsha, Archdiocese of Changsha [Changsha]
Death PlaceBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 19
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,059

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast