Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Michael Fu Tie-shan] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Beijing [Peking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1931¹Born
1956²24.1Ordained PriestPriest
1979²47.1SelectedBishop of Beijing [Peking], China
21 Dec 197948.1Ordained BishopBishop of Beijing [Peking], China
20 Apr 200775.4DiedBishop of Beijing [Peking], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Fu Tie-shan
Bishop Michael Fu Tie-shan (born , died ) Bishop of Beijing [Peking]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlacePeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Sep 2020

Quantcast