Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Zhao Jingnong

Deceased

Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1909Born
22 May 193727.8Ordained PriestPriest
1951²41.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
1981²71.5SelectedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
24 Jul 198172.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China
16 May 200494.8DiedBishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin Zhao Jingnong
Bishop Augustin Zhao Jingnong (born , died ) Bishop of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChengxian
Ordained BishopPeking, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceTianshui, Diocese of Tianshui [Tsinchow]

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Sep 2020

Quantcast