Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Pan Shao-qing] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateEventTitle
1958¹SelectedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
20 Apr 1958Ordained BishopBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
5 Feb 1983DiedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pan Shao-qing
Bishop Pan Shao-qing (died ) Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Xianian, Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,235

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast