Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop John Wang Qi-wei (Wang Ki Wei)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1921²Born
5 Jul 195837.5SelectedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
20 Jul 195837.5Ordained BishopBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
1990²69.0ResignedBishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
199776.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for John Wang Qi-wei (Wang Ki Wei)
Bishop John Wang Qi-wei (Wang Ki Wei) (born 1921, died 1997) Bishop Emeritus of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Baoding, Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 14
  • r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Sep 2020

Quantcast