Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Chen Du-qing] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Ganzhou [Kanchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1909²Born
9 Oct 195849.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ganzhou [Kanchow], China
25 Aug 199081.6DiedBishop of Ganzhou [Kanchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Chen Du-qing
Bishop Chen Du-qing (born 1909, died ) Bishop of Ganzhou [Kanchow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNanchang, Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]

  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14*, Number 17
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 16 Sep 2020

Quantcast