Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Wu Shi-zhen

Deceased

Archbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1921Born
25 Mar 194928.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 198766.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
21 Jul 199170.5AppointedBishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China
25 Aug 201493.5DiedBishop of Nanchang [Nanchang], China

MicroData Summary for John Wu Shi-zhen
Archbishop John Wu Shi-zhen (born , died ) Archbishop of Nanchang [Nanchang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuzhou
Ordained BishopBeijing, Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
Death PlaceNanchang, Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,015, Page 1,145
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,105
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast