Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damase Zhang Hanmin

Deceased

Bishop of Jilin [Kirin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1924³Born
24 Mar 198359.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 199571.6SelectedAdministrator of Jilin [Kirin], China
1997²72.9SelectedBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China
9 May 199975.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China
19 Jul 200985.5DiedBishop of Jilin [Kirin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Damase Zhang Hanmin
Bishop Damase Zhang Hanmin (born , died ) Bishop of Jilin [Kirin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXiaobajia village /Jilin
Ordained BishopJilin, Diocese of Jilin [Kirin]
Death PlaceChangchun

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast