Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Kim Nam-su

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Suwon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1922BornSuwon-shi
17 Oct 194826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pusan, Korea (South)
5 Oct 197452.3AppointedBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
21 Nov 197452.5Ordained BishopBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
22 Nov 198361.5AppointedBishop of Korea, Military
23 Oct 198967.4ResignedBishop of Korea, Military
4 Jun 199775.0RetiredBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
1 Jun 200280.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Suwon, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Angelo Kim Nam-su:
Bishop Angelo Kim Nam-su (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Suwon

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2003, Page 1,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013