Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Choi Deok-ki

Bishop Emeritus of Suwon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1948 BornP'yongt'aek
10 Oct 197527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Suwon, Korea (South)
11 Jan 199648.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
22 Feb 199648.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
4 Jun 199749.4SucceededBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
30 Mar 200961.2ResignedBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Choi Deok-ki:
Bishop Paul Choi Deok-ki (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Suwon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Suwon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,736

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013