Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Ri Iong-hoon (Lee Yong-Hoon)

Bishop of Suwon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1951 BornKyoûng-ghi
6 Mar 197927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Suwon, Korea (South)
19 Mar 200351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
19 Mar 200351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
14 May 200351.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Catabum Castra
10 Oct 200857.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
30 Mar 200957.5SucceededBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Mathias Ri Iong-hoon (Lee Yong-Hoon):
Bishop Mathias Ri Iong-hoon (Lee Yong-Hoon) (born ) Bishop of Suwon

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Suwon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013