Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victorinus Youn Kong-hi

Archbishop Emeritus of Gwangju


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1924 BornChinnamp'o
20 Mar 195025.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 196338.9AppointedBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
20 Oct 196338.9Ordained BishopBishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
25 Oct 197348.9AppointedArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
30 Nov 200076.0RetiredArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Victorinus Youn Kong-hi:
Archbishop Victorinus Youn Kong-hi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gwangju

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gwangju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015