Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Simon Ok Hyun-jjn

Archbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1968 Born
26 Jan 199425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gwangju, Korea (South)
12 May 201143.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
12 May 201143.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pederodiana
6 Jul 201143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pederodiana
19 Nov 202254.7AppointedArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
30 Nov 202254.7InstalledArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Simon Ok Hyun-jjn
(WikiData: Q2287747)
Archbishop Simon Ok Hyun-jjn (born ) Archbishop of Gwangju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuan, Archdiocese of Gwangju
Ordained BishopCathedral, Kwangju, Archdiocese of Gwangju

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gwangju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 May 2011
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 May 2011
  • c3+: CB, 11 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,111
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2022
  • i: AM, 24 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 25 Nov 2022