Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kwangju

Archidioecesis Kvangiuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Hyginus Kim Hee-jong, Archbishop
  • Simon Ok Hyun-jjn, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Andreas Choi Chang-mou, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Victorinus Youn Kong-hi, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1962
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 12,596 (4,865 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.kjcatholic.or.kr/
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Office, 997-1 Sangmu 2 Dong, Seo-Gu, Kwangju 502-855, Korea
  • Telephone: (062)380-2801
  • Fax: 380-2806

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kwoszu
13 April 1937ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kwoszu (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Kwangju
12 July 1950Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Kwoszu Prefecture Apostolic of Kwangju
Vicariate Apostolic of Kwangju
21 January 1957ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Kwangju Vicariate Apostolic of Kwangju
Archdiocese of Kwangju
10 March 1962ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kwangju Archdiocese of Kwangju

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Kwangju
19496,9783,295,000.2%41923303323ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kwangju
Archdiocese of Kwangju
197075,0574,688,4041.6%87631505007715443ap1971
198081,7364,028,0002.0%3336691,1846115750ap1981
1990175,8333,777,7234.7%75321071,6439636260ap1991
1999262,2793,492,7257.5%137301671,57011946088ap2000
2000273,5523,515,9987.8%144321761,55415450390ap2001
2001281,4933,517,9028.0%182131951,44311949896ap2002
2002288,6023,509,8418.2%190142041,41414454197ap2003
2003294,7713,461,1468.5%200232231,321101653100ap2004
2004301,4483,425,1058.8%201272281,322134562102ap2005
2010329,9513,373,3159.8%211592701,222178544119ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013