Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Edward Michaels, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia

Titular Bishop of Verbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1926BornChicago
21 Dec 195125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Society of St. Columban
15 Feb 196639.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
15 Feb 196639.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Verbe
14 Apr 196639.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verbe
3 Apr 197346.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wheeling, West Virginia, USA
22 Sep 198761.3ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA
21 Sep 201084.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston, West Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for James Edward Michaels:
Bishop James Edward Michaels S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Wheeling-Charleston

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 15 Dec 2014