Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Patrick Thomas Brennan, S.S.C.M.E. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kwangju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1901Born
1928²26.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
1936²34.8ProfessedMember of Missionary Society of St. Columban
12 Nov 194847.6AppointedPrefect of Kwoszu, Korea (South)
24 Sep 1950³49.5DiedPrefect of Kwangju, Korea (South)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Thomas Brennan
Father Patrick Thomas Brennan S.S.C.M.E. (born , died ) Prefect of Kwangju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained PriestChicago, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Buried Place (Original)Bellevue, NB

  • a priest for 22.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c1: CB, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 7 Sep 2020

Quantcast