Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hyginus Kim Hee-jong

Archbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1947 Born
5 Jul 197528.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gwangju, Korea (South)
9 Jul 200356.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
9 Jul 200356.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Corniculana
18 Aug 200356.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corniculana
10 Jul 200962.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)
25 Mar 201063.0SucceededArchbishop of Gwangju, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Hyginus Kim Hee-jong
Archbishop Hyginus Kim Hee-jong (born ) Archbishop of Gwangju

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBukkyu-dong Mopko-shi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gwangju.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,441

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Aug 2017