Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Kim Ok-kyun

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Seoul

Titular Bishop of Girba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1925BornYong-In
18 Dec 195429.0Ordained PriestPriest of Seoul, Korea (South)
9 Mar 198559.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
9 Mar 198559.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
25 Apr 198559.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
12 Dec 200176.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Seoul, Korea (South)
1 Mar 201084.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Paul Kim Ok-kyun:
Bishop Paul Kim Ok-kyun (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Seoul

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013