Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Lee Ki-heon

Bishop of Uijongbu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1947 BornP'yong-yang
8 Dec 197527.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 199951.8AppointedBishop of Korea, Military
14 Dec 199952.0Ordained BishopBishop of Korea, Military
26 Feb 201062.2AppointedBishop of Uijongbu, Korea (South)
4 May 201062.3InstalledBishop of Uijongbu, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Peter Lee Ki-heon:
Bishop Peter Lee Ki-heon (born ) Bishop of Uijongbu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Uijongbu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,657
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013