Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Linus Lee Seong-hyo

Auxiliary Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1957 Born
9 Apr 199234.7Ordained PriestPriest of Suwon, Korea (South)
7 Feb 201153.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Suwon, Korea (South)
7 Feb 201153.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni
25 Mar 201153.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turris Tamalleni

MicroData Summary for Linus Lee Seong-hyo
Bishop Linus Lee Seong-hyo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Suwon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGi-dong Paldal-gu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Suwon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,976

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018