Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René Marie Albert Dupont, M.E.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Andong, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1929 Born
29 Jun 195323.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 May 196939.7AppointedBishop of Andong, Korea (South)
25 Jul 196939.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andong, Korea (South)
6 Oct 199061.0ResignedBishop of Andong, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for René Marie Albert Dupont
Bishop René Marie Albert Dupont M.E.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Andong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Jean-le-Blanc, France

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Andong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast