Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Pius Jin Peixian] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Liaoning)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1924Born
29 Jan 195126.8Ordained PriestPriest
1989²64.7SelectedBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
21 May 198965.1Ordained BishopBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
29 Jun 200884.2ResignedBishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
4 Nov 200884.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pius Jin Peixian
Bishop Pius Jin Peixian (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDandong City/Fushun
Ordained BishopShijiazhuang
Death PlaceShenyang, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,119
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,575
  • bd/r/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Additions/Corrections (front), Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast