Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Louis Liu Huanbo] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Harbin [Harbin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1910²Born
1936²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 199080.6Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Harbin [Harbin], China
1993²83.0AppointedBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China
19 Jan 199787.0DiedBishop of Harbin [Harbin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Liu Huanbo
Bishop Louis Liu Huanbo (born 1910, died ) Bishop of Harbin [Harbin]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopHarbin, Apostolic Administration of Harbin [Harbin]

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,122
  • fn/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast