Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Simon (Andreas) Zhu Wenyu (Zhu Xiang yu, Zhu Weng, Zhu Wen Han)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Chifeng [Chihfeng], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1919Born
12 Apr 195737.3Ordained PriestPriest
Apr 1990³70.3SelectedBishop of Chifeng [Chihfeng], China
28 Oct 199070.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chifeng [Chihfeng], China
24 Sep 200686.8DiedBishop of Chifeng [Chihfeng], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon (Andreas) Zhu Wenyu (Zhu Xiang yu, Zhu Weng, Zhu Wen Han)
Bishop Simon (Andreas) Zhu Wenyu (Zhu Xiang yu, Zhu Weng, Zhu Wen Han) (born , died ) Bishop of Chifeng [Chihfeng]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKulitu
Ordained BishopSuiyuan, Archdiocese of Hohhot [Suiyüan]
Death PlaceKulitu

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast