Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Datong [Tatung]

Dioecesis Tatomensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Taiyuan [TaiyŁan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 20,000 (7,725 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Datong, Shanxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tatungfu
14 March 1922ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale} (Tatung-fu, Jang-kao, Tienchen, Hunyuan, Kwangling, and Lingkin) Prefecture Apostolic of Tatungfu (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tatungfu
17 June 1932ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tatungfu Vicariate Apostolic of Tatungfu
Diocese of Datong [Tatung]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tatungfu Diocese of Datong [Tatung]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Datong [Tatung]
19507,7021,000,000.8%671359216ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Prefecture Apostolic of Tatungfu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 273
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Tatungfu
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 24, Page 373
  • Diocese of Datong [Tatung]
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 301, to Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024