Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Thaddeus Guo Yingong] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Datong [Tatung], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1917Born
4 Aug 194629.2Ordained PriestPriest
1990²72.6SelectedBishop of Datong [Tatung], China
8 Jul 199073.1Ordained BishopBishop of Datong [Tatung], China
4 Jan 200587.6DiedBishop of Datong [Tatung], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Guo Yingong
Bishop Thaddeus Guo Yingong (born , died ) Bishop of Datong [Tatung]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXubao Village, Diocese of Datong [Tatung]
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Taiyuan, Archdiocese of Taiyuan [Taiyüan]
Death PlaceDaton, Diocese of Datong [Tatung]

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,104
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast