Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Huo Cheng

Bishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1926 Born
14 May 1954³28.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 199165.1SelectedBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
4 Sep 199165.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fenyang [Fenyang], China
1992²65.9ConfirmedBishop

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Huo Cheng
Bishop John Huo Cheng (born ) Bishop of Fenyang [Fenyang]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFenyang, Diocese of Fenyang [Fenyang]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fenyang [Fenyang].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,126
  • fn/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast