Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Gerard-Joseph Hoogers, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Tatungfu, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1867Born
189022.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
31 Dec 189427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Jun 191850.4AppointedSuperior of I-li o Kul-Dia, China
192254.0ResignedSuperior of I-li o Kul-Dia, China
3 Mar 192355.2AppointedSuperior of Tatungfu, China
28 Sep 193163.7ResignedSuperior of Tatungfu, China
21 Jul 194577.6DiedSuperior Emeritus of Tatungfu, China

MicroData Summary for Gerard-Joseph Hoogers
Father Gerard-Joseph Hoogers C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Tatungfu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorst, Belgium

  • a priest for 50.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018