Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]

Dioecesis Tienzinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,560 (4,851 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Laosikai, Tianjin, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo}
27 April 1912ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tientsin [Tianjin]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Coastal Chi-Li {Ce-Li Marittimo} Vicariate Apostolic of Tientsin [Tianjin]
Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tientsin [Tianjin] Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tianjin [Tientsin]
195050,0003,600,0001.4%2955845957412223ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 1 Apr 2013